NJ S4249 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain unclassified State employees to receive certain salary increases.
Title
Requires certain unclassified State employees to receive certain salary increases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-11) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4249 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A6109 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A6109 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee