NJ S4225 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5840 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns joint liability for payment of employer tax law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns joint liability for payment of employer tax law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09SenateSubstituted by A5840 (2R)
2019-12-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5840 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.374.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback