NJ S4203 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5972 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5972 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank's enabling act.
Title
Makes changes to New Jersey Infrastructure Bank's enabling act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A5972 (1R) |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5972 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.516.