NJ S4165 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A892
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.443.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.443.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands University Hospital board of directors membership from 11 to 13 members.**
Title
Expands University Hospital board of directors membership from 11 to 13 members.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4364 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4364 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.443. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-2-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (73-2-0) (Giblin) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Giblin) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4364 (2R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4165 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.443.
A4364 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4165 (1R)
A4364 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4165 (1R)