NJ S4147 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $16,380,595 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Title
Appropriates $16,380,595 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues to NJ Historic Trust for grants for certain historic preservation projects and associated administrative expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6216 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6216 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.318. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A6216 |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6216 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4147