NJ S414 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2917

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved P.L.2018, c.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts, charter schools, nonpublic schools, and contracted service providers to review employment history of prospective employees who will have regular contact with students to ascertain allegations of child abuse or sexual misconduct.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts, charter schools, nonpublic schools, and contracted service providers to review employment history of prospective employees who will have regular contact with students to ascertain allegations of child abuse or sexual misconduct.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3381 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.5.
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2018-02-15AssemblySubstituted for A3381
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-02-01SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2917 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2199 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3381 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Substituted by S414 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback