NJ S413 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1409
Note: Carry Foward to future S761
Note: Carry Over of previous S3350
Note: Carry Over of previous A4237
Note: Carry Foward to future S761
Note: Carry Over of previous S3350
Note: Carry Over of previous A4237
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid fee-for-service coverage of managed long term services and supports when beneficiary is pending enrollment in managed care organization.
Title
Requires Medicaid fee-for-service coverage of managed long term services and supports when beneficiary is pending enrollment in managed care organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S413 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S413 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3350 (Carry Over) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4237 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4012 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S413 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3350 (Carry Over) 2021-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4237 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A4012 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee