NJ S4081 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.317.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.317.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain utility discontinuances; establishes Winter Termination Program; requires BPU to include sewer and water public utilities in Winter Termination Program.
Title
Prohibits certain utility discontinuances; establishes Winter Termination Program; requires BPU to include sewer and water public utilities in Winter Termination Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6115 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.317. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A6115 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6115 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4081 (2R)