NJ S4068 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns use of certain emergency and amber warning lights.
Title
Concerns use of certain emergency and amber warning lights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5693 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading