NJ S4011 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.197.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Modifies New Jersey Community-Anchored Development Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies New Jersey Community-Anchored Development Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 57 N: 8 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5650 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2023, c.197.
2023-12-21AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (57-8-1)
2023-12-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2023-12-21SenatePassed by the Senate (29-5)
2023-12-11Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (25-6)
2023-11-27SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2023-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-4-0)
2023-06-30AssemblySubstituted for A5650 (1R)
2023-06-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2023-06-30SenatePassed by the Senate (26-11)
2023-06-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2023-06-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5650 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S4011 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback