NJ S3982 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.173.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes $135 million in federal funds available to EDA to support eligible entities impacted by COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Makes $135 million in federal funds available to EDA to support eligible entities impacted by COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5904 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5904 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.173. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A5904 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5904 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3982