NJ S3982 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5631
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies certain requirements for State agency review of complaint of workplace discrimination.
Title
Specifies certain requirements for State agency review of complaint of workplace discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A5631 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5631 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.347.