NJ S3975 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.413.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.413.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements to commence screening newborn infants for congenital cytomegalovirus infection; establishes public awareness campaign.
Title
Establishes requirements to commence screening newborn infants for congenital cytomegalovirus infection; establishes public awareness campaign.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5963 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5963 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.413. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A5963 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Greenstein) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (35-0) (Greenstein) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5963 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3975 (2R)