NJ S3965 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinds prohibition on return of certain items purchased from retail food stores during COVID-19 state of emergency; provides that future limitations on returns occur during declared public health emergency.
Title
Rescinds prohibition on return of certain items purchased from retail food stores during COVID-19 state of emergency; provides that future limitations on returns occur during declared public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5906 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5906 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.150.