NJ S3959 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5886
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Awards project grants under "Securing Our Children's Future Fund" for school security projects in certain school districts; appropriates $66,173,243.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Awards project grants under "Securing Our Children's Future Fund" for school security projects in certain school districts; appropriates $66,173,243.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24SenateSubstituted by A5886
2021-06-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5886 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.145.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback