NJ S3953 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Approved P.L.2023, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates unexpended funds from "1999 Statewide Transportation and Local Bridge Fund."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates unexpended funds from "1999 Statewide Transportation and Local Bridge Fund."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5606 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30AssemblyApproved P.L.2023, c.82.
2023-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-1-1)
2023-06-30AssemblySubstituted for A5606
2023-06-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2023-06-30SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2023-06-20SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-06-15SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2023-06-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5606 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3953

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback