NJ S3953 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A4831
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies classification in this State of criminal offenses committed in other states or under federal law.
Title
Clarifies classification in this State of criminal offenses committed in other states or under federal law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4831 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4831 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.298.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3953 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S4000/3953_I1.HTM |