NJ S3945 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.242.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.242.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of Food Insecurity Advocate.
Title
Establishes Office of Food Insecurity Advocate.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5884 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5884 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.242. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A5884 (3R) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mazzeo) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5884 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3945 (2R)