NJ S3943 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.94.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Allows Attorney General to appoint officer in charge when superseding certain law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows Attorney General to appoint officer in charge when superseding certain law enforcement agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5593 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-03AssemblyApproved P.L.2023, c.94.
2023-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-29-0)
2023-06-30AssemblySubstituted for A5593
2023-06-27AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2023-06-26SenatePassed by the Senate (24-12)
2023-06-12SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-06-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5593 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3943

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback