NJ S3942 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (31-0) (Gopal)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (31-0) (Gopal)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to stagger issuance dates of SNAP benefits to newly eligible enrollees.
Title
Requires DHS to stagger issuance dates of SNAP benefits to newly eligible enrollees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5881 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)