NJ S393 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3478

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.125.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Talent Network Program in DOLWD.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Talent Network Program in DOLWD.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3417 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.125.
2019-06-10AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-1)
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2019-01-31Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2018-12-17SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-8-0)
2018-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A3417 (1R)
2018-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-22AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3478 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3417 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S393/973 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback