NJ S3929 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain requirements for involuntary commitment for mental health treatment.
Title
Revises certain requirements for involuntary commitment for mental health treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Rep. John McKeon [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5182 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5182 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.139. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-1-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A5182 (3R) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5182 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3929 (3R)