NJ S3919 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5583 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits sale, lease, rent or installation of certain equipment or products containing hydrofluorocarbons or other greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits sale, lease, rent or installation of certain equipment or products containing hydrofluorocarbons or other greenhouse gases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateSubstituted by A5583 (2R)
2020-01-09SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-11-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5583 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.507.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback