NJ S3918 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5849 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5849 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Adjutant General of DMVA send weekly reports to Commissioner of DOH on status of veterans' homes in State during every future public health emergency; requires such reports through December 31, 2021.
Title
Requires Adjutant General of DMVA send weekly reports to Commissioner of DOH on status of veterans' homes in State during every future public health emergency; requires such reports through December 31, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5849 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Lagana) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5849 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.214.