NJ S3916 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1229
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.223.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.223.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for wildlife fencing programs to farmers leasing farmland; clarifies eligibility and provides for uniform funding levels for grant recipients.
Title
Expands eligibility for wildlife fencing programs to farmers leasing farmland; clarifies eligibility and provides for uniform funding levels for grant recipients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5486 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5486 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.223. |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5486 (1R) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3916 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.223.
A5486 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S3916 (2R)
A5486 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S3916 (2R)