NJ S3915 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S355
Note: Carry Foward to future A3710
Note: Carry Foward to future A3710
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent temporary enactment allowing certain alcoholic beverage retailers to sell and deliver alcoholic beverages and mixed drinks; establishes certain sale and delivery privileges for alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Title
Makes permanent temporary enactment allowing certain alcoholic beverage retailers to sell and deliver alcoholic beverages and mixed drinks; establishes certain sale and delivery privileges for alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3915 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3915 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5848 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3915 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5848 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading