NJ S3908 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5855
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA veterans' facilities provide payroll-based journal information to NJ Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Title
Requires DMVA veterans' facilities provide payroll-based journal information to NJ Long-Term Care Ombudsman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5855 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5855 (Same As) 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.220.