NJ S3895 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires specialized in-service training regarding crime victims for police departments in certain high-crime areas.
Title
Requires specialized in-service training regarding crime victims for police departments in certain high-crime areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A5388 |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5388 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.501.