NJ S3859 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that certain employees of educational institutions are eligible for unemployment benefits under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that certain employees of educational institutions are eligible for unemployment benefits under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-06SenateTransferred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2019-06-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4485 (Same As) 2018-09-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback