NJ S382 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S113

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires uniform response procedures for all domestic crisis teams established or participated in by law enforcement agencies, and strengthens Statewide supervision over teams; expands topics required in training courses. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires uniform response procedures for all domestic crisis teams established or participated in by law enforcement agencies, and strengthens Statewide supervision over teams; expands topics required in training courses. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2021-06-24SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-06-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S113 (Carry Over) 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1769 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback