NJ S3811 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.282.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.282.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Kean University as public urban research university.
Title
Establishes Kean University as public urban research university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5769 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5769 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.282. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5769 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5769 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3811 (1R)