NJ S3810 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S290
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.411.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.411.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Responsible Collective Negotiations Act."
Title
"Responsible Collective Negotiations Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5862 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5862 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.411. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (50-26-1) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A5862 (ACS) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-14) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Addiego) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Addiego) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3810 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.411.
A5862 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3810 (4R)
A5862 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3810 (4R)