NJ S3805 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5509 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for breastfeeding support.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health benefits and Medicaid coverage for breastfeeding support.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted by A5509 (ACS/1R)
2019-11-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-07SenateRecommitted to Senate Commerce Committee
2019-06-27SenateSenate Substitution (29-0) (Ruiz)
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5509 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.343.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback