NJ S3783 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c,118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-20 - Approved P.L.2023, c,118.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certain provisions of "New Jersey Innovation Evergreen Act" and "Food Desert Relief Act."
Title
Modifies certain provisions of "New Jersey Innovation Evergreen Act" and "Food Desert Relief Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5541 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5541 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c,118. |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-4-0) |
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted for A5541 (1R) |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5541 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by S3783 (1R)