NJ S3763 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.433.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.433.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames joint meetings as regional service agencies; grandfathers existing joint meetings.
Title
Renames joint meetings as regional service agencies; grandfathers existing joint meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6116 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.433. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A6116 |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6116 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3763