NJ S3759 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2160
Note: Carry Foward to future A5701
Note: Carry Foward to future A5701
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates special education unit within the Office of Administrative Law; requires annual report.
Title
Creates special education unit within the Office of Administrative Law; requires annual report.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3759 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3759 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3759 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee