NJ S3742 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1014
Note: Carry Foward to future A2656
Note: Carry Over of previous A2369
Note: Carry Foward to future A2656
Note: Carry Over of previous A2369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires retail pharmacies to stock and dispense emergency contraception.
Title
Requires retail pharmacies to stock and dispense emergency contraception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3742 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3742 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1717 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2369 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S3742 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1717 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A2369 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee