NJ S374 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A982
Note: Carry Over of previous S4337
Note: Carry Over of previous A6061
Note: Carry Over of previous S4337
Note: Carry Over of previous A6061
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to establish inmate reentry services committee.
Title
Requires each county to establish inmate reentry services committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4337 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A844 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A6061 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S4337 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A844 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A6061 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee