NJ S3734 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5329 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5329 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends useful service life of certain school buses to 20 years; provides temporary one-year extension of service life of Type S school buses.
Title
Extends useful service life of certain school buses to 20 years; provides temporary one-year extension of service life of Type S school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A5329 (1R) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5329 (Same As) 2023-08-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.144.