NJ S3724 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $5 million to New Jersey Pediatric Cancer Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $5 million to New Jersey Pediatric Cancer Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5766 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2021-06-24AssemblySubstituted for A5766
2021-06-21AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-21AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2021-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
2021-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2021-05-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-05-06SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5766 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3724 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback