NJ S3690 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A5696 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A5696 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises modified basic training program for certain county correctional police officers to be certified as county prosecutor's detectives or investigators or county or municipal police officers.
Title
Revises modified basic training program for certain county correctional police officers to be certified as county prosecutor's detectives or investigators or county or municipal police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted by A5696 (2R) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Scutari) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5696 (Same As) 2021-06-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.107.