NJ S3686 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5322 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes program for cultivation, handling, processing, transport, and sale of hemp; repeals New Jersey Industrial Hemp Pilot Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes program for cultivation, handling, processing, transport, and sale of hemp; repeals New Jersey Industrial Hemp Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted by A5322 (2R)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-05-16SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5322 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.238.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback