NJ S3632 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.347.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.347.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands exemption from restrictions on health care practitioner referrals; requires certain referrals to be made in accordance with certain professional standards.
Title
Expands exemption from restrictions on health care practitioner referrals; requires certain referrals to be made in accordance with certain professional standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5645 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5645 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.347. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5645 (1R) |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5645 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S3632 (1R)