NJ S3600 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5580 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by A5580 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restores and revises Urban Enterprise Zone program; appropriates $42,500,000.
Title
Restores and revises Urban Enterprise Zone program; appropriates $42,500,000.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | Substituted by A5580 (3R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5580 (Same As) 2021-08-17 - Approved P.L.2021, c.197.