NJ S3599 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.144.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises neighborhood revitalization tax credit program to increase permitted annual tax credit allocation to $15 million.
Title
Revises neighborhood revitalization tax credit program to increase permitted annual tax credit allocation to $15 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5185 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.144. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A5185 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5185 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S3599