NJ S3596 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4220
Note: Carryover of previous A4220

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A1918 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns temporary registration certificates for automobiles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted by A1918 (2R)
2017-12-18SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Pennacchio)
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-12-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1918 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-1)
A4220 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4220 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback