NJ S3579 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S2713

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain permanency hearing to be held at least every six months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain permanency hearing to be held at least every six months.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-08AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2021-06-30SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2021-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Singleton)
2021-05-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3579 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback