NJ S3577 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Substituted by A4035 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires gubernatorial appointment of State Agriculture Development Committee executive director.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires gubernatorial appointment of State Agriculture Development Committee executive director.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSubstituted by A4035 (2R)
2023-03-20SenateSenate Amendment (Voice) (Ruiz)
2023-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-02-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4035 (Same As) 2023-05-18 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback