NJ S3576 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3474
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renames State's "Transgender Day of Remembrance" as "Babs Siperstein Transgender Day of Remembrance."
Title
Renames State's "Transgender Day of Remembrance" as "Babs Siperstein Transgender Day of Remembrance."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3576 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5074 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5074 (Same As) 2019-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading