NJ S3544 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5159 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits county commissioner of registration and board of elections to use electronic poll books.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits county commissioner of registration and board of elections to use electronic poll books.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A5159 (1R)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-14SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5159 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Approved P.L.2019, c.80.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback